Senate | 05/13/2015 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1546 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |