E | 05/22/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/22/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1947 | |
E | 05/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1537 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1490 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3002 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#871 | Journal Page: 3002 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3002 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3002 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 989 | Journal Page: 2914 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2965 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 998 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 295 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |