House | 05/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 735 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 735 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 735 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 692 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 671 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |