House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2810 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1827 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1054 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 205 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 205 | |
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |