E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3349
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3349
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3349
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1562
|
Journal Page: 4825
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4825
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4825
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4700
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1532
|
Journal Page: 4699
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4699
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Howard
|
Journal Page: 4698
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4697
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Guillen
|
Journal Page: 4694
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
1-Howard
|
Journal Page: 4693
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Howard
|
Journal Page: 4693
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Howard
|
Journal Page: 4693
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4693
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4514
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1449
|
Journal Page: 4513
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/26/15 6:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4513
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4513
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2671
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2671
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 213
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 213
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|