6 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 5 | | relating to building code requirements for residential property |
---|
8 | 6 | | insured by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. |
---|
9 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 2210.251(f), Insurance Code, is amended |
---|
11 | 9 | | to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 10 | | (f) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, |
---|
13 | 11 | | insurance coverage for a residential structure may be issued or |
---|
14 | 12 | | renewed through the association subject to the inspection |
---|
15 | 13 | | requirements imposed under Section 2210.258, if applicable. [This |
---|
16 | 14 | | subsection expires December 31, 2015.] |
---|
17 | 15 | | SECTION 2. Sections 2210.258(a) and (c), Insurance Code, |
---|
18 | 16 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
19 | 17 | | (a) Except as provided by Subsection (c) [and Section |
---|
20 | 18 | | 2210.2581] and notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, |
---|
21 | 19 | | to be eligible for insurance through the association, all |
---|
22 | 20 | | construction, alteration, remodeling, enlargement, and repair of, |
---|
23 | 21 | | or addition to, any structure located in the catastrophe area that |
---|
24 | 22 | | is begun on or after the effective date of Sections 5 through 49, |
---|
25 | 23 | | H.B. [No.] 4409, [Acts of the] 81st Legislature, Regular Session, |
---|
26 | 24 | | 2009, must be performed in compliance with the applicable building |
---|
27 | 25 | | code standards, as set forth in the plan of operation. |
---|
28 | 26 | | (c) The association may insure a residential structure |
---|
29 | 27 | | constructed, altered, remodeled, enlarged, repaired, or added to on |
---|
30 | 28 | | or after June 19, 2009, that is not in compliance with the |
---|
31 | 29 | | applicable building code standards, as set forth in the plan of |
---|
32 | 30 | | operation, provided that: |
---|
33 | 31 | | (1) the structure had been insured on or after June 19, |
---|
34 | 32 | | 2009, by an insurer in the private market that canceled or |
---|
35 | 33 | | nonrenewed the insurance coverage of the structure [before December |
---|
36 | 34 | | 31, 2015]; |
---|
37 | 35 | | (2) the applicant provides to the association proof |
---|
38 | 36 | | that insurance coverage that was issued to the applicant or the |
---|
39 | 37 | | previous insured for the structure was canceled or nonrenewed in |
---|
40 | 38 | | the private market as described by Subdivision (1); and |
---|
41 | 39 | | (3) no construction, alteration, remodeling, |
---|
42 | 40 | | enlargement, or repair of, or addition to, the structure occurred |
---|
43 | 41 | | after cancellation or nonrenewal of the coverage and before |
---|
44 | 42 | | submission of an application for coverage through the association. |
---|
45 | 43 | | SECTION 3. Section 2210.2581, Insurance Code, is repealed. |
---|
46 | 44 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
47 | 45 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
48 | 46 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
49 | 47 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
50 | 48 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
| 49 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 50 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 51 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 498 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 52 | + | April 21, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 6. |
---|
| 53 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 54 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 55 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 498 passed the House on |
---|
| 56 | + | May 18, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 106, Nays 29, one |
---|
| 57 | + | present not voting. |
---|
| 58 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 59 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 60 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 61 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 62 | + | Date |
---|
| 63 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 64 | + | Governor |
---|