E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1811
|
Journal Page: 5891
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5891
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3479
|
Journal Page: 5890
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6023
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1061
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5520
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5520
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5211
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5211
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5211
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2868
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2665
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4805
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Aycock
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Objections withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3896
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1547
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1454
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1454
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1454
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 214
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 214
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|