Senate | 03/04/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 221 | |
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |