House
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3641
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
CA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 995
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 995
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 672
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 245
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 245
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|