Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB521 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser, Watson, Zaffirini S.B. No. 521
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2015; February 18, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water,
 and Rural Affairs; April 1, 2015, reported favorably, as amended,
 by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 1, 2015, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By:  Kolkhorst, Hall
 Amend S.B. 521 (introduced version) as follows:
 (1)  In SECTION 1 of the bill, in amended Section 11.139(a),
 Water Code (page 1, line 50), strike "two years [120 days]" and
 substitute "270 days".
 (2)  In SECTION 1 of the bill, in amended Section 11.139(a),
 Water Code (page 1, line 56), strike "The commission may renew an
 [Such]" and substitute "Such".
 (3)  In SECTION 1 of the bill, in amended Section 11.139(a),
 Water Code (page 1, lines 57-58), strike "authorization granted
 under Subsection (a) [action may be renewed once]" and substitute
 "action maybe renewed once".
 (4)  In SECTION 1 of the bill, in amended Section 11.139(a),
 Water Code (page 1, line 58), strike "successive periods of".
 (5)  In SECTION 1 of the bill, in amended Section 11.139(a),
 Water Code (page 1, lines 58-59), strike "one year each [60 days]"
 and substitute "90 days".
 (6)  In SECTION 1 of the bill, in amended Section 11.139(a),
 Water Code (page 1, line 59-page 2, line 1), strike the following:
 "The commission may provide for automatic renewals of an
 authorization for periods of not longer than one year each."
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period for which the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality may grant or renew an emergency authorization
 relating to the use of state water.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.139, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 11.148 [of this code], the
 commission may grant an emergency permit, order, or amendment to an
 existing permit, certified filing, or certificate of adjudication
 after notice to the governor for an initial period of not more than
 two years [120 days] if the commission finds that:
 (1)  emergency conditions exist which present an
 imminent threat to the public health and safety and which override
 the necessity to comply with established statutory procedures; and
 (2)  there are no feasible practicable alternatives to
 the emergency authorization.
 (a-1)  The commission may renew an [Such] emergency
 authorization granted under Subsection (a) [action may be renewed
 once] for successive periods of not longer than one year each [60
 days].  The commission may provide for automatic renewals of an
 authorization for periods of not longer than one year each.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, the change in law made by this Act applies only to an
 application for an emergency authorization or renewal of an
 emergency authorization that is submitted to the Texas Commission
 on Environmental Quality on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An application for an emergency authorization or renewal of an
 emergency authorization that is submitted to the commission before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  If on or after the effective date of this Act a person
 submits to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality an
 application for the renewal of an emergency authorization that was
 granted by the commission before the effective date of this Act, the
 commission may renew the emergency authorization once for a period
 of not longer than one year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *