E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5842
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1796
|
Journal Page: 5842
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5841
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5206
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5206
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4983
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4983
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4983
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4226
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1338
|
Journal Page: 4225
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4225
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4225
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4157
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4157
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3845
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 672
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 245
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 245
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|