E | 06/01/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/01/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3644 | |
E | 05/21/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1850 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4082 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1850 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1738 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1198 | Journal Page: 3801 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3801 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3801 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3794 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3794 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 2262 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2262 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 247 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 247 | |
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |