Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB551 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/18/2015

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 551
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2015; February 18, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water,
 and Rural Affairs; March 18, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duty of the Water Conservation Advisory Council to
 submit a report and recommendations regarding water conservation in
 this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 10.011, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 10.011.  REPORT. Not later than December 1 of each
 even-numbered year, the council shall submit to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives:
 (1)  a report on progress made in water conservation in
 this state; and
 (2)  recommendations for legislation to advance water
 conservation in this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *