LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB551
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB551
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB551
Compare Versions
SB551 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB551 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB551 Enrolled June 1, 2015
SB551 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
SB551 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB551 Comm Sub March 18, 2015
SB551 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB551 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB551 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB551 Enrolled June 1, 2015
SB551 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
SB551 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB551 Comm Sub March 18, 2015
SB551 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare