LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB57
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB57
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB57
Compare Versions
SB57 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB57 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB57 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB57 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
SB57 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB57 Comm Sub March 30, 2015
SB57 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB57 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB57 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB57 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB57 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
SB57 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB57 Comm Sub March 30, 2015
SB57 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare