Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB58 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/30/2015

                    By: Nelson, Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 58
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 26, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 30, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 2; April 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of commercial vehicle safety standards
 by certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 644.101(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A sheriff or a deputy sheriff of a county bordering the
 United Mexican States or of a county with a population of 700,000
 [one million] or more is eligible to apply for certification under
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *