House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 3105 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3105 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1326 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1326 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1326 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1326 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1202 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/16/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |