E | 05/28/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3103 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1715 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1119 | Journal Page: 3580 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3580 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3580 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3557 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3557 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1766 | Journal Page: 3557 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3547 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1827 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |