E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3331
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3331
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3331
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2406
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4691
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1527
|
Journal Page: 4691
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4691
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4691
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4567
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1458
|
Journal Page: 4566
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4566
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 4566
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/25/15 4:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4560
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Isaac
|
Journal Page: 4560
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Isaac
|
Journal Page: 4560
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Isaac
|
Journal Page: 4538
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4534
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 267
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 267
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|