Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB645 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/19/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R7935 MK-F
 By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 645


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine and
 recommend revisions to any state laws pertaining to juvenile
 records.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS.  In this Act:
 (1)  "Advisory committee" means the Juvenile Records
 Advisory Committee appointed under Section 2 of this Act.
 (2)  "Board" means the Texas Juvenile Justice Board.
 SECTION 2.  JUVENILE RECORDS ADVISORY COMMITTEE. Not later
 than December 1, 2015, the board shall appoint an advisory
 committee to develop a plan for studying, reorganizing, and
 comprehensively revising Chapter 58, Family Code, and any other
 relevant laws pertaining to juvenile records.
 SECTION 3.  APPOINTMENTS; PRESIDING OFFICER. (a) In making
 appointments to the advisory committee, the board shall include
 members who are interested parties, including:
 (1)  chief juvenile probation officers;
 (2)  juvenile prosecutors;
 (3)  juvenile defense attorneys;
 (4)  juvenile court judges;
 (5)  justice court or municipal court judges;
 (6)  court administrators or court clerks;
 (7)  peace officers;
 (8)  representatives of the Department of Public
 Safety;
 (9)  representatives of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services;
 (10)  representatives of the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department;
 (11)  juvenile justice advocates;
 (12)  individuals with expertise in federal records and
 federal immigration policy;
 (13)  members of the public; and
 (14)  any other individuals that the board considers
 necessary to accomplish the duties of the advisory committee.
 (b)  The board shall designate one of the members as
 presiding officer of the advisory committee.
 SECTION 4.  REPORT.  (a)  Not later than November 1, 2016,
 the advisory committee shall submit to the legislature and the
 board the recommendations for revisions to Chapter 58, Family Code,
 and any other relevant laws pertaining to juvenile records and a
 copy of the plan developed by the committee under Section 2 of this
 Act to produce those recommendations.
 (b)  The advisory committee may submit:
 (1)  preliminary recommendations at any time before
 submitting the report required under Subsection (a) of this
 section; and
 (2)  follow-up recommendations at any time after
 submitting the report required under Subsection (a) of this
 section.
 SECTION 5.  COMPENSATION.  Members of the advisory committee
 serve without compensation and are not entitled to reimbursement
 for expenses.
 SECTION 6.  APPLICATION OF LAWS GOVERNING ADVISORY
 COMMITTEES. The advisory committee is not subject to Chapter 2110,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 7.  EXPIRATION DATE. The advisory committee is
 abolished and this Act expires December 31, 2018.
 SECTION 8.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.