E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6022
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3488
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3488
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5609
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4933
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4933
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1930
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3687
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1167
|
Journal Page: 3687
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3687
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3687
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3413
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3413
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3413
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 578
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 578
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 578
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 578
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 383
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 281
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 281
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|