Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5520
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5520
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2229
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4143
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1314
|
Journal Page: 4142
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4142
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4142
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3976
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Workman
|
Journal Page: 3976
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3976
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 281
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 281
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|