E | 05/28/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3103 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1741 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 3899 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1566 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3277 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#989 | Journal Page: 3276 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3276 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3276 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 3197 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Amended | 1-Crownover | Journal Page: 3192 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3192 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 2847 | Journal Page: 3192 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1595 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 953 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 826 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 826 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 826 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 826 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 826 |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 826 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 825 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |