E | 05/22/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/22/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1947 | |
E | 05/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1537 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1469 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2909 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#821 | Journal Page: 2908 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2908 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2908 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2725 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2725 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2725 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1484 | Journal Page: 2725 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2810 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1493 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 452 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 281 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 281 | |
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |