Senate | 04/09/2015 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 282 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 282 | |
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |