E | 05/23/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2026 | |
E | 05/14/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1613 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3545 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1593 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1613 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1566 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3276 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#988 | Journal Page: 3275 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3275 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3275 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3191 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3191 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3190 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 1944 | Journal Page: 3190 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2138 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 760 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 283 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 283 | |
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |