Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB691 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Birdwell S.B. No. 691
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2015; February 25, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 9, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 9, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to tuition and fee exemptions for certain students
 enrolled in fire science courses at public institutions of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.353(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The governing board of an institution of higher
 education shall exempt from the payment of tuition and laboratory
 fees any student enrolled in one or more courses offered as part of
 a fire science curriculum who:
 (1)  is employed as a firefighter by a political
 subdivision of this state; or
 (2)  is currently, and has been for at least one year,
 an active member of an organized volunteer fire department
 [participating in the Texas Emergency Services Retirement System or
 a retirement system established under the Texas Local Fire Fighters
 Retirement Act (Article 6243e, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes) and]
 who [holds]:
 (A)  holds an Accredited Advanced level of
 certification, or an equivalent successor certification, under the
 State Firefighters' [Firemen's] and Fire Marshals' Association of
 Texas volunteer certification program; [or]
 (B)  holds a Phase V (Firefighter II)
 certification, or an equivalent successor certification, under the
 Texas Commission on Fire Protection's voluntary certification
 program under Section 419.071, Government Code; or
 (C)  participates in the Texas Emergency Services
 Retirement System or a retirement system established under the
 Texas Local Fire Fighters Retirement Act (Article 6243e, Vernon's
 Texas Civil Statutes).
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.353(a), Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with tuition and laboratory fees
 charged for the 2015 fall semester. Tuition and laboratory fees
 charged for an academic period before that semester are covered by
 the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *