House | 05/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3909 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Birdwell | Journal Page: 734 |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 706 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 452 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 311 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |