E
|
06/19/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3306
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2406
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1494
|
Journal Page: 4657
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4657
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 4657
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 4657
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 4657
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4657
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4490
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4490
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4490
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1442
|
Journal Page: 4489
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Elkins
|
Journal Page: 4489
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Kuempel
|
Journal Page: 4488
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4488
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 707
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 292
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 292
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|