House | 05/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1051 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 590 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 590 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 590 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 590 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 588 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 588 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA1 Huffines | Journal Page: 588 |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 588 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Motion to table fails | Journal Page: 587 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA2 Fraser | Journal Page: 587 |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffines | Journal Page: 586 |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 586 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 586 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 586 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 550 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 279 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 279 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |