Senate | 04/28/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |