House | 05/22/2015 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1844 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1050 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1050 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1050 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1050 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1049 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Nelson | Journal Page: 1049 |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1049 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1049 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 707 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 692 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 303 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 303 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |