House | 05/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 3261 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3261 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2830 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1407 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 452 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |