E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5695
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3473
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3473
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3473
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3473
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2666
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4815
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4815
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4815
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4815
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4784
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4785
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4784
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3896
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|