E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2845
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2845
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2845
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2176
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1311
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1030
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 512
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 453
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 293
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 293
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|