Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB752 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 752


 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of the inheritance tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.   Chapter 211, Tax Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 124.001(3), Estates Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (3)  "Estate tax" means any estate, inheritance, or
 death tax levied or assessed on the property of a decedent's estate
 because of the death of a person and imposed by federal, state,
 local, or foreign law, including the federal estate tax and the
 inheritance tax imposed by former Chapter 211, Tax Code, and
 including interest and penalties imposed in addition to those
 taxes.  The term does not include a tax imposed under Section
 2701(d)(1)(A), Internal Revenue Code of 1986 (26 U.S.C. Section
 2701(d)).
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act do not affect
 tax liability accruing before the effective date of this Act. That
 liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been enacted,
 and the former law is continued in effect for the collection of
 taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of the liability
 for those taxes.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 752 passed the Senate on
 March 25, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 752 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor