House
|
05/25/2015
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4569
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 8, Section 1; Rule 11, Section 2; and Rule 11, Section 3; Article III, More
|
Journal Page: 4568
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4568
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/25/15 5:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4562
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3; Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 4562
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4562
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
8-C. Turner, Muoz, and Raymond
|
Journal Page: 4561
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2; Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 4561
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
6-P. King and Raymond
|
Journal Page: 4501
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
5-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4501
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4501
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1445
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Motion to table fails
|
5-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
4-K. King
|
Journal Page: 4497
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4491
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 685
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 453
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|