E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4136
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1306
|
Journal Page: 4136
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4136
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4135
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3961
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1258
|
Journal Page: 3961
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3961
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3961
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 672
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 453
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|