Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB775 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fraser S.B. No. 775
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; March 18, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of the goal for natural gas use.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.9044, Utilities Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 40.004, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 40.004.  JURISDICTION OF COMMISSION. Except as
 specifically otherwise provided in this chapter, the commission has
 jurisdiction over municipally owned utilities only for the
 following purposes:
 (1)  to regulate wholesale transmission rates and
 service, including terms of access, to the extent provided by
 Subchapter A, Chapter 35;
 (2)  to regulate certification of retail service areas
 to the extent provided by Chapter 37;
 (3)  to regulate rates on appeal under Subchapters D
 and E, Chapter 33, subject to Section 40.051(c);
 (4)  to establish a code of conduct as provided by
 Section 39.157(e) applicable to anticompetitive activities and to
 affiliate activities limited to structurally unbundled affiliates
 of municipally owned utilities, subject to Section 40.054;
 (5)  to establish terms and conditions for open access
 to transmission and distribution facilities for municipally owned
 utilities providing customer choice, as provided by Section 39.203;
 (6)  to require collection of the nonbypassable fee
 established under Section 39.903(b) and to administer the renewable
 energy credits program under Section 39.904(b) [and the natural gas
 energy credits program under Section 39.9044(b)]; and
 (7)  to require reports of municipally owned utility
 operations only to the extent necessary to:
 (A)  enable the commission to determine the
 aggregate load and energy requirements of the state and the
 resources available to serve that load; or
 (B)  enable the commission to determine
 information relating to market power as provided by Section 39.155.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *