House
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA7 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 1225
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1224
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA3 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA4 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1220
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1220
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 308
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 308
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|