House
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3896
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1372
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1372
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1372
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1372
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1372
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1371
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 308
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 308
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|