E | 05/29/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/29/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3440 | |
E | 05/21/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1850 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4082 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1850 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | RV#1227 | Journal Page: 3864 |
House | 05/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Postponed | 5/20/15 11:28 AM | Journal Page: 3854 |
House | 05/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3854 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3817 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3817 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 715 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |