Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB782 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2015

                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 782
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 30, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 30, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 782 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the investigation by the commissioner of insurance of
 acts of insurance fraud.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 701.102, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 701.102.  INVESTIGATION OF CERTAIN ACTS OF FRAUD. If
 the commissioner has reason to believe a person has engaged in, is
 engaging in, has committed, or is about to commit a fraudulent
 insurance act [or the offense of insurance fraud under Section
 35.02(a), Penal Code], the commissioner may conduct any
 investigation necessary inside or outside this state to:
 (1)  determine whether the act [or offense] occurred;
 or
 (2)  aid in enforcing laws relating to fraudulent
 insurance acts, including by providing technical or litigation
 assistance to other governmental agencies [or insurance fraud].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *