Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB783 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 783
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2015; March 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 30, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development of antifraud educational programs by
 the Texas Department of Insurance and acceptance of gifts, grants,
 and donations for the department's fraud unit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 701, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 701.004 and 701.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 701.004.  ANTIFRAUD EDUCATION. The commissioner,
 through the insurance fraud unit, shall develop fraud prevention
 educational programs and disseminate materials necessary to
 educate the public effectively regarding antifraud programs.
 Sec. 701.005.  GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. (a)  The
 insurance fraud unit may accept gifts, grants, and donations to
 enable the fraud unit to perform its duties under this chapter.
 (b)  The insurance fraud unit may not accept gifts, grants,
 or donations from a regulated entity.
 (c)  All gifts, grants, or donations to the insurance fraud
 unit shall be:
 (1)  deposited to the credit of the department's
 operating account; and
 (2)  distributed to the insurance fraud unit to be used
 to perform its duties under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *