E
|
05/15/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
E
|
05/05/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1263
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1997
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 934
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 950
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 815
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 760
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 524
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 524
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 309
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 309
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|