E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1248
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3928
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3879
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Geren
|
Journal Page: 3879
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3879
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/20/15 12:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Geren
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 309
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 309
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|