E
|
05/29/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1469
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2905
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#817
|
Journal Page: 2904
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2904
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2904
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#688
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
1-C. Anderson
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/7/15 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2647
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 979
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2810
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|