House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 590 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 589 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ellis | Journal Page: 589 |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 589 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 589 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 499 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 453 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 279 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 279 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |