E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3899
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#965
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
1-R. Miller, Smith, Farias, Sheets, Schaefer, and Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3060
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Guillen
|
Journal Page: 3060
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3060
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2996
|
Journal Page: 3060
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 626
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 626
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 626
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 626
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 625
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 625
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 625
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 452
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 421
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 323
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 323
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|