E | 05/23/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2026 | |
E | 05/14/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1613 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3545 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1593 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1613 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#919 | Journal Page: 3137 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3116 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3116 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1480 | Journal Page: 3116 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2920 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1826 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1057 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 1020 |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 324 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 324 | |
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |